Liu, Mingdi (SFC:AKU877) 劉鳴鏑
SFC licenses
Rep=Representative, RO=Responsible Officer. A person without a starting date was in that role since at least 1-Apr-2003 when the current register began.
Some data are hidden to fit your display. Rotate?
Organisation | Role | Activity | From | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
1 | Credit Agricole Securities (Asia) Limited | Rep | Advising on securities | 2008-05-16 | 2011-05-24 | RO | Advising on securities | 2011-05-24 | 2012-04-12 |
2 | J.P. MORGAN BROKING (HONG KONG) LIMITED | Rep | Advising on futures contracts | 2021-10-19 | Rep | Advising on securities | 2021-10-19 |
3 | Merrill Lynch (Asia Pacific) Limited | Rep | Advising on securities | 2004-06-16 | 2005-04-22 | Rep | Dealing in securities | 2004-06-16 | 2007-05-17 |
4 | NOMURA INTERNATIONAL (HONG KONG) LIMITED | Rep | Advising on securities | 2012-05-11 | 2012-08-01 | RO | Advising on securities | 2012-08-01 | 2018-09-06 |
5 | UBS SECURITIES ASIA LIMITED | Rep | Advising on securities | 2018-11-15 | 2021-05-31 |
Sign up for our free newsletter
Recommend Webb-site to a friend
Copyright & disclaimer, Privacy policy